AL HB70 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, reinsurance, regulation and credit against reserves, adoption of similar to Credit for Reinsurance Model Law by Nat. Assoc. of Insurance Commissioners, Secs. 27-5B-8.1, 27-5B-20 added; Secs. 27-5B-3, 27-5B-9, 27-5B-11, 27-5B-14, 27-5B-19 am'd.
Title
Insurance, reinsurance, regulation and credit against reserves, adoption of similar to Credit for Reinsurance Model Law by Nat. Assoc. of Insurance Commissioners, Secs. 27-5B-8.1, 27-5B-20 added; Secs. 27-5B-3, 27-5B-9, 27-5B-11, 27-5B-14, 27-5B-19 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 113 |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |