AL HB70 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Age of majority, lowered to 18 years, to retain the age limitation for tobacco sales, Secs. 26-1-1, 13A-12-3
Title
Age of majority, lowered to 18 years, to retain the age limitation for tobacco sales, Secs. 26-1-1, 13A-12-3
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 87 |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 86 |
2017-02-23 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |