AL HB69 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement benefits, State Police Tier II Plan, to reopen to any employee of the State Law Enforcement Agency who is certified by the Alabama Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission and perform law enforcement duties, Secs. 36-27-1, 36-27-16, 41-27-7 am'd.
Title
Retirement benefits, State Police Tier II Plan, to reopen to any employee of the State Law Enforcement Agency who is certified by the Alabama Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission and perform law enforcement duties, Secs. 36-27-1, 36-27-16, 41-27-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 51 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Pettus motion to Adopt Roll Call 50 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Pettus motion to Adopt Roll Call 50 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2022-02-08 | House | Sanderford intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 51 |
2022-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
SB74 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 27 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 27 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 27 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |