AL HB69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Healthcare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prescriptions, practitioner, electronic prescription specify whether a generic may be dispensed, Sec. 34-23-8 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescriptions, practitioner, electronic prescription specify whether a generic may be dispensed, Sec. 34-23-8 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenatePending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Healthcare
2019-05-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
2019-05-02HouseEngrossed
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 479
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 478
2019-05-02HouseMooney Amendment Offered
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 477
2019-05-02HouseInsurance Amendment Offered
2019-05-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB69&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB69-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB69-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199423-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199575-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615265&VOTE=477&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615267&VOTE=478&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615270&VOTE=479&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback