AL HB69 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Competitive Bid law, purchase and installation of heating and air conditioning units for local boards of education, exempted when bid pursuant to purchasing cooperative and process approved by Dept. of Examiners of Public Accounts, Secs. 39-1-5, 39-2-2 am'd.
Title
Competitive Bid law, purchase and installation of heating and air conditioning units for local boards of education, exempted when bid pursuant to purchasing cooperative and process approved by Dept. of Examiners of Public Accounts, Secs. 39-1-5, 39-2-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Standridge motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:06 p.m. on March 22, 2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-413. |
2018-03-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-22 | House | Standridge motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1003 |
2018-03-22 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 938 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 937 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2018-02-20 | House | Engrossed |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 410 |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 409 |
2018-02-20 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |