AL HB69 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and municipalities, competitive bids, heavy equipment or vehicle, add exception for repair by dealer or authorized service center, Sec. 41-16-52 am'd.
Title
Counties and municipalities, competitive bids, heavy equipment or vehicle, add exception for repair by dealer or authorized service center, Sec. 41-16-52 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Hurst motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 7:29 p.m. on May 19, 2017. |
2017-05-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-466. |
2017-05-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Hurst motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1044 |
2017-05-19 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1330 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Beasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1329 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Beasley first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Beasley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |
2017-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 377 |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |