AL HB68 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:35 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:35 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure, protected person defined, child under 16 a person with intellectual disability, protected person to be offered protection in criminal prosecutions for physical offenses, sexual offenses, and violent offenses, use of anatomically correct dolls or mannequins during testimony of a child under 12 or a protected person, authorized, Sec. 15-25-7 added; Sec. 15-25-33 repealed; Secs. 15-25-1, 15-25-2, 15-25-3, 15-25-5, 15-25-6, 15-25-30, 15-25-31, 15-25-32, 15-25-34, 15-25-36, 15-25-37, 15-25-38, 15-25-39 am'd.
Title
Criminal procedure, protected person defined, child under 16 a person with intellectual disability, protected person to be offered protection in criminal prosecutions for physical offenses, sexual offenses, and violent offenses, use of anatomically correct dolls or mannequins during testimony of a child under 12 or a protected person, authorized, Sec. 15-25-7 added; Sec. 15-25-33 repealed; Secs. 15-25-1, 15-25-2, 15-25-3, 15-25-5, 15-25-6, 15-25-30, 15-25-31, 15-25-32, 15-25-34, 15-25-36, 15-25-37, 15-25-38, 15-25-39 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Simpson motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 726 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 679 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 678 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 677 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 106 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 105 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 679 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 678 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 677 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 106 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 105 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:35 p.m. on March 29, 2022. |
2022-03-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-201. |
2022-03-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-29 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-03-29 | House | Simpson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 726 |
2022-03-29 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 679 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 678 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Givhan Amendment Offered |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 106 |
2022-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB235 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 25 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 33 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 25 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |