AL HB68 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Courts Judicial Resources Allocation, Chief Justice of Supreme Court of Alabama, require to reassign judges for prompt administration of justice, presiding circuit judge, authorized to reassign judges within circuit, Secs. 12-9A-7, 12-9A-8 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts Judicial Resources Allocation, Chief Justice of Supreme Court of Alabama, require to reassign judges for prompt administration of justice, presiding circuit judge, authorized to reassign judges within circuit, Secs. 12-9A-7, 12-9A-8 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Hill motion to Table (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseForwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-567.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28HouseHill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1078
2018-03-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1031
2018-03-22SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1030
2018-03-22SenateWard Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-02-22HouseEngrossed
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 441
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 440
2018-02-22HouseHill Amendment Offered
2018-02-22HouseHill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 439
2018-02-22HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB68&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB68-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB68-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB68-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190903-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192140-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193823-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590295&VOTE=439&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590301&VOTE=440&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590302&VOTE=441&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599961&VOTE=1030&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599962&VOTE=1031&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602160&VOTE=1078&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback