AL HB68 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lobbying, executive branch, prohibited from contracting lobbyists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lobbying, executive branch, prohibited from contracting lobbyists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20SenatePending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2016-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-07SenateRereferred to Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
2016-02-24SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2016-02-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 63
2016-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback