AL HB679 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Died in Senate Basket.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Died in Senate Basket.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DeKalb Co., dogs, dangerous dogs in unincorporated areas of county, procedure for determining, dog required to be kept in fenced enclosure, penalties, const. amend.
Title
DeKalb Co., dogs, dangerous dogs in unincorporated areas of county, procedure for determining, dog required to be kept in fenced enclosure, penalties, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Died in Senate Basket. |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1094 |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |