AL HB675 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., personnel system, appeals, planning and zoning director to be appointed contract, employee, Sec. 45-2-120.08 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., personnel system, appeals, planning and zoning director to be appointed contract, employee, Sec. 45-2-120.08 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 25) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-416 on 06/09/2015.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-03HouseEnrolled
2015-06-03HousePassed Second House
2015-06-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1363
2015-05-26HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 998
2015-06-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-26HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 997
2015-06-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-26HouseEngrossed
2015-05-26HouseBaldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered
2015-05-26HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-26SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-05-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute
2015-05-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB675
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB675-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB675-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB675-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=521573&VOTE=996&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=521574&VOTE=997&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=521573&VOTE=997&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=521574&VOTE=998&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=525067&VOTE=1363&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback