AL HB672 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., gasoline and motor fuel tax, co. comm. auth. to levy, collection, distrib., enforcement, penalties
Title
Macon Co., gasoline and motor fuel tax, co. comm. auth. to levy, collection, distrib., enforcement, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-414. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1340 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1014 |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |