AL HB667 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages, municipal option elections, minimum of 1,440 day period between such elections, Sec. 28-2A-1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages, municipal option elections, minimum of 1,440 day period between such elections, Sec. 28-2A-1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateFurther Consideration
2015-06-04HouseEngrossed
2015-06-04SenateReed motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2015-06-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-06-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
2015-05-28HouseEngrossed
2015-05-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1182
2015-05-28HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1181
2015-05-28HouseCounty and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
2015-05-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-05-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback