AL HB667 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish, yellow perch raised in farm ponds, excluded from sale prohibition, Sec. 9-11-84 am'd.
Title
Game and fish, yellow perch raised in farm ponds, excluded from sale prohibition, Sec. 9-11-84 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 841 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |