AL HB665 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Blount County, tobacco tax, penalties for failure to collect tax, Sec. 45-5-244 am'd
Title
Blount County, tobacco tax, penalties for failure to collect tax, Sec. 45-5-244 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-447 on 05/16/2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1262 | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 781 | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |