AL HB662 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Blount Co., sheriff, expense allowance authorized by county commission
Title
Blount Co., sheriff, expense allowance authorized by county commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Scofield motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - Thomas motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2012-05-17 - House - Thomas motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-534. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-16 | Scofield motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1563 | |
2012-05-16 | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-16 | Thomas motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1575 | |
2012-05-16 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1266 | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 763 | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |