AL HB66 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Delivered to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Delivered to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic Dev, property adjacent to U.S. Air Force Base, mun. or co. authorized to form authority for development, issuance of bonds, tax exemptions
Title
Economic Dev, property adjacent to U.S. Air Force Base, mun. or co. authorized to form authority for development, issuance of bonds, tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 12, 2020. |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-72. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-03-12 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 375 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2020-02-18 | House | Engrossed |
2020-02-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 42 |
2020-02-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 41 |
2020-02-18 | House | Ingram Amendment Offered |
2020-02-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 40 |
2020-02-18 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2020-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |