AL HB66 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 5:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mayors, legislative functions in cities/towns with 12,000 or more but less than 25,000 inhabitants, authorized to continue operating as a city or town with less than 12,000 inhabitants by majority vote of council and mayor under certain conditions, veto power restricted, Secs. 11-43-2, 11-43-3, 11-43-40, 11-45-4, 11-45-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mayors, legislative functions in cities/towns with 12,000 or more but less than 25,000 inhabitants, authorized to continue operating as a city or town with less than 12,000 inhabitants by majority vote of council and mayor under certain conditions, veto power restricted, Secs. 11-43-2, 11-43-3, 11-43-40, 11-45-4, 11-45-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
2018-03-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-281.
2018-03-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-15SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled
2018-03-15HousePassed Second House
2018-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 860
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government
2018-02-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 366
2018-02-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback