AL HB66 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fire protection sprinkler systems, State Fire Marshal authorized to issue permits to certain fire protection sprinkler contractors, further authorized, system plans and any changes designed by licensed engineer, certain data collected and published by State Fire Marshal required, Secs. 34-33-1, 34-33-2, 34-33-4, 34-33-5, 34-33-6, 34-33-7, 34-33-9, 34-33-10 am'd.
Title
Fire protection sprinkler systems, State Fire Marshal authorized to issue permits to certain fire protection sprinkler contractors, further authorized, system plans and any changes designed by licensed engineer, certain data collected and published by State Fire Marshal required, Secs. 34-33-1, 34-33-2, 34-33-4, 34-33-5, 34-33-6, 34-33-7, 34-33-9, 34-33-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. James Hanes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017. |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-240. |
2017-05-02 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 760 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 165 |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 164 |
2017-03-07 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |