AL HB66 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2016 at 8:41 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2016 at 8:41 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure, extending immunity to certain firefighter paramedics or firefighter emergency medical technicians, Sec. 6-5-338 am'd.
Title
Civil procedure, extending immunity to certain firefighter paramedics or firefighter emergency medical technicians, Sec. 6-5-338 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2016 at 8:41 p.m. on May 3, 2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-294. |
2016-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 909 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 390 |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |