AL HB656 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., tax on sale of personal property, distrib. to county general fund, exceptions, Act 405, 1967 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., tax on sale of personal property, distrib. to county general fund, exceptions, Act 405, 1967 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Merika Coleman-Evans [D] | Rep. Juandalynn Givan [D] | Rep. Lawrence McAdory [D] | Rep. Jack Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 83) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Givan motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Givan motion to suspend rules to take up out of order (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 76) [FAIL]
2011-05-31 - House - Givan motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Givan motion to suspend rules to take up out of order (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 76) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Suspend Rules lost Roll Call 1021 | |
2011-05-31 | Givan motion to Suspend Rules lost Roll Call 961 | |
2011-05-26 | Canfield intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-05-26 | Givan motion to suspend rules to take up out of order lost Roll Call 921 | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |