AL HB655 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., constables, fees and gasoline allowance increased, Sec. 12-19-92 am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., constables, fees and gasoline allowance increased, Sec. 12-19-92 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 55 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 55 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-352. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1384 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1006 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |