AL HB64 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Nursing, Board of, investigators granted power of peace officers, Act 2017-46, 2017 Reg. Sess.; Sec. 34-21-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing, Board of, investigators granted power of peace officers, Act 2017-46, 2017 Reg. Sess.; Sec. 34-21-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 852
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 851
2018-03-15HouseHealth Amendment Offered
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback