AL HB638 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professional license or certificate, application for military personnel expedited, provide exemptions from licensing fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional license or certificate, application for military personnel expedited, provide exemptions from licensing fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Moore (B) motion to Table (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-533.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1486
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-03 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2012-05-03 Engrossed
2012-05-03 Buskey, Bracy and Kennedy intended to vote "Yea"
2012-05-03 Cosponsors Added
2012-05-03 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1243
2012-05-03 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1242
2012-05-03 Moore (B) first Substitute Offered
2012-05-03 Moore (B) motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote
2012-05-03 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-03 Time Expired
2012-05-03 Moore (B) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1235
2012-05-03 Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered
2012-05-03 Third Reading Open
2012-04-26 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-04-03 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB638
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB638-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB638-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB638-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444836&VOTE=1235&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444960&VOTE=1242&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444973&VOTE=1243&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444978&VOTE=1244&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450479&VOTE=1486&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback