AL HB636 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Irondale, municipal court, prisoner transport fee authorized for transporting defendants on misdemeanor warrants from another municipal jail
Title
Irondale, municipal court, prisoner transport fee authorized for transporting defendants on misdemeanor warrants from another municipal jail
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 70 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 70 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-411. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1199 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 986 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 2 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1053 |
2013-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |