AL HB635 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lincoln, certain property deannexed
Title
Lincoln, certain property deannexed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-413. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1428 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 712 |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |