AL HB632 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Muscle Shoals, city bd. of ed., membs. election from city at large., qualifications, terms, comp., filling vacancies, referendum
Title
Muscle Shoals, city bd. of ed., membs. election from city at large., qualifications, terms, comp., filling vacancies, referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 889 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |