AL HB627 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tuscaloosa Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized under certain conditions outside the city limits of Tuscaloosa and Northport, referendum
Title
Tuscaloosa Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales authorized under certain conditions outside the city limits of Tuscaloosa and Northport, referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-600. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 912 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 884 | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation |