AL HB611 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Battleship Commission, certain employees added to definition of retiree, State Employees' Insurance Board determines years of creditable service, retroactive effect, Act 2011-698, 2011 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 36-29-1 am'd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Battleship Commission, certain employees added to definition of retiree, State Employees' Insurance Board determines years of creditable service, retroactive effect, Act 2011-698, 2011 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 36-29-1 am'd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-20 - House - Buskey motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-20 - Senate - Glover motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-530.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Buskey motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1602
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1470
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-16 Glover Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2012-05-16 Glover motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1468
2012-05-16 Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-05-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2012-04-26 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2012-04-24 Engrossed
2012-04-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 949
2012-04-24 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 948
2012-04-24 Clouse Amendment Offered
2012-04-24 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-12 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-22 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB611
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB611-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB611-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB611-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=440483&VOTE=948&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=440484&VOTE=949&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450378&VOTE=1468&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450391&VOTE=1470&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450785&VOTE=1602&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback