AL HB609 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., Oil and Gas Severance Tax Trust Fund, loans to county, repayment, Sec. 45-2-245.20 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., Oil and Gas Severance Tax Trust Fund, loans to county, repayment, Sec. 45-2-245.20 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Whatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseForwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 6:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-327.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20HouseMcMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1230
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20HouseConcurrence Requested
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1061
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1060
2013-05-20SenateDial Amendment Offered
2013-04-25SenateWhatley to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 576
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-25SenateSmitherman motion to rerefer
2013-05-09SenateDial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 947
2013-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2013-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-23HouseEngrossed
2013-04-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665
2013-04-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 664
2013-04-23HouseBaldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered
2013-04-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-18HouseActed on by Baldwin County Legislation as Favorable with 1 substitute
2013-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB609
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB609-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB609-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB609-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=467746&VOTE=664&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=467747&VOTE=665&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=470105&VOTE=576&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=474795&VOTE=947&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475846&VOTE=1060&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475847&VOTE=1061&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475915&VOTE=1230&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback