AL HB607 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lauderdale Co., co. health dept., authorized fee for site evaluations for repair of existing system
Title
Lauderdale Co., co. health dept., authorized fee for site evaluations for repair of existing system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-420. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1473 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 775 |
2019-05-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |