AL HB607 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Covington Co., lodging tax, add'l levy, Sec. 45-20-243 am'd.
Title
Covington Co., lodging tax, add'l levy, Sec. 45-20-243 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-272. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1097 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 663 |
2015-05-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |