AL HB607 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:23 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Fund, transfer of funds from numerous funds of various agencies, departments, etc. for fiscal year ending September 30, 2013

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Fund, transfer of funds from numerous funds of various agencies, departments, etc. for fiscal year ending September 30, 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-18 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Forwarded to Governor at 4:23 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-545.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1546
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1279
2012-05-09 Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1278
2012-05-09 Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2012-05-09 Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1277
2012-05-09 Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2012-05-09 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2012-04-24 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2012-04-10 Engrossed
2012-04-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 663
2012-04-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 662
2012-04-10 Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2012-04-10 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-03-22 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB607
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB607-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB607-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB607-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=436523&VOTE=662&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=436541&VOTE=663&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448029&VOTE=1277&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448065&VOTE=1278&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448032&VOTE=1279&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449863&VOTE=1546&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback