AL HB605 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., Fort Morgan Preservation District, established, planning and zoning commission established, authority related to planning and zoning in Fort Morgan area, procedures for appeals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., Fort Morgan Preservation District, established, planning and zoning commission established, authority related to planning and zoning in Fort Morgan area, procedures for appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-411.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-06-03HouseEnrolled
2015-06-03HouseMotion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1245
2015-06-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-06-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1355
2015-06-03SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1354
2015-06-03SenateLocal Legislation Amendment Offered
2015-06-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-06-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-05-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 786
2015-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB605
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB605-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB605-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=518721&VOTE=786&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=525034&VOTE=1354&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=525035&VOTE=1355&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=525425&VOTE=1245&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback