AL HB605 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 4:40 p.m. on May 9, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 4:40 p.m. on May 9, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals, private hospital assessments for Medicaid funding, extended until 2016, public hospitals exempt, intergovernmental transfer for Medicaid funding, Secs. 40-26B-70, 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77, 40-26B-78, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.; Sec. 40-26B-77.1 added
Title
Hospitals, private hospital assessments for Medicaid funding, extended until 2016, public hospitals exempt, intergovernmental transfer for Medicaid funding, Secs. 40-26B-70, 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77, 40-26B-78, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.; Sec. 40-26B-77.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 4:40 p.m. on May 9, 2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-246. |
2013-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 925 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 924 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 923 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 709 |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 708 |
2013-04-23 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |