AL HB603 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Title
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Sanderford motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Sanderford motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 991 |
2013-04-25 | House | Sanderford motion to Table adopted Roll Call 990 |
2013-04-25 | House | Hubbard (J) Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 989 |
2013-04-25 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |