AL HB603 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Delivered to Governor at 10:52 a. m. on April 12, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Delivered to Governor at 10:52 a. m. on April 12, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prepaid Affordable College Tuition (PACT) Program, PACT Board authorized to revise program to meet actuarial requirements, Sec. 16-33C-23 added; Secs. 16-33C-17, 16-33C-19 repealed; Secs. 16-33C-16, 16-33C-20 am'd
Title
Prepaid Affordable College Tuition (PACT) Program, PACT Board authorized to revise program to meet actuarial requirements, Sec. 16-33C-23 added; Secs. 16-33C-17, 16-33C-19 repealed; Secs. 16-33C-16, 16-33C-20 am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Love [R] | Rep. Mary McClurkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Delivered to Governor at 10:52 a. m. on April 12, 2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-12 | Assigned Act No. 2012-198. | |
2012-04-12 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-12 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 562 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-04-05 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 594 | |
2012-04-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 593 | |
2012-04-05 | Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 592 | |
2012-04-05 | Ford Substitute to Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |