AL HB603 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conecuh Co., board of education, authorized to insure school buildings and property in State Insurance Fund or in an insurance company
Title
Conecuh Co., board of education, authorized to insure school buildings and property in State Insurance Fund or in an insurance company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-597. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 932 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 777 | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |