AL HB600 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2015 - 75% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tuscaloosa Co., sales and use tax levy increased, distribution of proceeds altered, Tuscaloosa Co. Road Improvement Commission created, Act No. 56, 1953 Reg. Sess., Sections 1, 3, 4, and 11, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tuscaloosa Co., sales and use tax levy increased, distribution of proceeds altered, Tuscaloosa Co. Road Improvement Commission created, Act No. 56, 1953 Reg. Sess., Sections 1, 3, 4, and 11, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on May 21, 2015.
2015-05-21SenateSignature Requested
2015-05-21HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-05-21HouseEnrolled
2015-05-21HousePassed Second House
2015-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1095
2015-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-12SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-05-12HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 657
2015-05-12HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback