AL HB600 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1580
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public authorities, Small Business Financing Authority, created within the Department of Economic and Community Affairs, incentives to small business, enrollment of certain loans with authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public authorities, Small Business Financing Authority, created within the Department of Economic and Community Affairs, incentives to small business, enrollment of certain loans with authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1580
2012-05-16 Blackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1579
2012-05-16 Blackwell Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Blackwell motion to Miscellaneous adopted Voice Vote
2012-05-16 Blackwell to reconsider B&I Amd adopted VV
2012-05-16 Blackwell to table Blackwell Amd #1 Tabled VV
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Blackwell motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2012-05-08 Blackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1175
2012-05-08 Blackwell Amendment Offered
2012-05-08 Blackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1174
2012-05-08 Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered
2012-05-08 Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Banking and Insurance with 1 amendment
2012-05-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-04-26 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
2012-04-26 Moore (B) intended to vote "Yea"
2012-04-26 Engrossed
2012-04-26 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1009
2012-04-26 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1008
2012-04-26 Moore (B) Amendment Offered
2012-04-26 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-26 Moore (B) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2012-04-26 Third Reading Carried Over
2012-04-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-22 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB600
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB600-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB600-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441134&VOTE=1008&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=441136&VOTE=1009&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=446390&VOTE=1174&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=446392&VOTE=1175&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451109&VOTE=1579&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451110&VOTE=1580&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback