AL HB60 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans, awarded the Silver Star or Bronze Star, distinctive license plates, requirement for proof on form DD214 deleted, Sec. 32-6-250.1 added; Secs. 32-6-250, 32-6-251 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans, awarded the Silver Star or Bronze Star, distinctive license plates, requirement for proof on form DD214 deleted, Sec. 32-6-250.1 added; Secs. 32-6-250, 32-6-251 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-400.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseShedd motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1011
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1173
2017-05-17SenateHoltzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1172
2017-05-17SenateVeterans and Military Affairs first Substitute Offered
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-03-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2017-03-02HouseMembers intended to cosponsor
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 127
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB60&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB60-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561475&VOTE=127&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561478&VOTE=128&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577429&VOTE=1172&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577430&VOTE=1173&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578806&VOTE=1011&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback