AL HB60 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:40 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health care, persons, employers, or health care providers, mandatory participation in any health care system prohibited, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care, persons, employers, or health care providers, mandatory participation in any health care system prohibited, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - Senate - Beason Motion to Table Bedford motion to reconsider (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Hammon motion to reconsider (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Galliher motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:40 p.m. on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-617.
2011-06-09 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Passed Second House
2011-06-09 Beason Motion to Table Bedford motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 1061
2011-06-09 Bedford motion to Reconsider.
2011-06-09 Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1059
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1060
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-04-19 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2011-04-05 Givan intended to vote Nay
2011-04-05 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 162
2011-04-05 Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 161
2011-04-05 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-05 Hammon motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 160
2011-03-29 Hammon Motion in Writing Filed
2011-03-24 Roberts and Sanderford inteded to vote "Yea" and Grimsley intended to vote "Nay"
2011-03-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 76
2011-03-24 Galliher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 75
2011-03-24 Hubbard (J) Amendment Offered
2011-03-24 Lost in house of origin
2011-03-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB60
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB60-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB60-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=399254&VOTE=75&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=399369&VOTE=76&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=401807&VOTE=161&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=401808&VOTE=162&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=401792&VOTE=160&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421809&VOTE=1059&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421806&VOTE=1060&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421814&VOTE=1061&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback