AL HB6 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-11 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Cosmetology and Barbering, Alabama Board of, schools of cosmetology and barbering, provide training programs above secondary level, Secs. 34-7B-1, 34-7B-26 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetology and Barbering, Alabama Board of, schools of cosmetology and barbering, provide training programs above secondary level, Secs. 34-7B-1, 34-7B-26 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - House - Hall motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-08-07 - House - Jackson motion to Previous Question (Y: 18 N: 58 NV: 10 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11HouseFurther Consideration
2015-08-11HouseJackson motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-10HouseHall motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time adopted Roll Call 45
2015-08-10HouseThird Reading Carried Over to Time Certain
2015-08-07HouseJackson motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-07HouseJackson motion to Previous Question lost Roll Call 37
2015-08-07HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback