AL HB598 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Municipalities, weed abatement, adoption of alternate procedures, Sec. 11-67-60.1 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities, weed abatement, adoption of alternate procedures, Sec. 11-67-60.1 added

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Further Consideration
2010-04-22 Smitherman request Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2010-04-22 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2010-03-23 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2010-03-30 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-03-23 Engrossed
2010-03-23 McLaughlin intended to vote "Yea"
2010-03-23 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 653
2010-03-23 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 652
2010-03-23 Scott Amendment Offered
2010-03-23 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-18 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback