AL HB596 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lowndes County, additional court costs assessed in circuit and district court, proceeds deposited in Circuit Clerk's Special Account

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lowndes County, additional court costs assessed in circuit and district court, proceeds deposited in Circuit Clerk's Special Account

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 55 Abs: 19) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Further Consideration
2012-05-16 Dial Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2012-05-16 Dial motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1422
2012-05-16 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-05-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-04-12 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2012-04-12 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 696
2012-04-12 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-22 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback