AL HB594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Assisted living administrators, licensure and regulation, voting members, fees, disciplinary actions, Secs. 34-2A-2, 34-2A-3, 34-2A-11, 34-2A-12, 34-2A-13 am'd.
Title
Assisted living administrators, licensure and regulation, voting members, fees, disciplinary actions, Secs. 34-2A-2, 34-2A-3, 34-2A-11, 34-2A-12, 34-2A-13 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Boothe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 995 | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 994 | |
2010-04-13 | Boothe Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |