AL HB593 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., Montgomery Industrial Development Board, two additional members appointed by county commission
Title
Montgomery Co., Montgomery Industrial Development Board, two additional members appointed by county commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2012-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-443. | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1240 | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 680 | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |