AL HB59 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and offenses, crimes motivated by race, color, religion, national origin, ethnicity, or physical or mental disability, to include employment as a law enforcement officer within the protected class, Sec. 13A-5-13 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses, crimes motivated by race, color, religion, national origin, ethnicity, or physical or mental disability, to include employment as a law enforcement officer within the protected class, Sec. 13A-5-13 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2020-02-13HouseSorrell intended to vote "Yea"
2020-02-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 28
2020-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-02-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-02-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback