AL HB59 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic violence, in the first, second, and third degree, committed in the presence of a minor, increased incarceration periods and enhanced penalties, Secs. 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence, in the first, second, and third degree, committed in the presence of a minor, increased incarceration periods and enhanced penalties, Secs. 13A-6-130, 13A-6-131 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-538.
2018-03-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled
2018-03-22HousePassed Second House
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1082
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed
2018-02-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 168
2018-02-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 167
2018-02-01HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-02-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback