AL HB589 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Florian, corp. limits alt.
Title
St. Florian, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 63 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 |
2017-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |